skip to content

Savage, David William

CPSO#: 103493

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Health Sciences Centre
Emergency Department
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6100 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Garnett ( CPSO# 95471 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. M. Wiltshire ( CPSO# 65013 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. D. Yee ( CPSO# 59895 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. S. Chapman ( CPSO# 93976 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4


Corporation Name: Dr. David Savage Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Health Sciences Centre
Emergency Department
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID WILLIAM SAVAGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAVAGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 27 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2017