skip to content

Jacobson, Bradley Albert

CPSO#: 83213

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6100 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. S. Chapman ( CPSO# 93976 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. D. Yee ( CPSO# 59895 )
Dr. M. Wiltshire ( CPSO# 65013 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. M. Garnett ( CPSO# 95471 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4


Corporation Name: Bradley Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BRADLEY ALBERT JACOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2007