skip to content

Lansdell, Kyle

CPSO#: 93305

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Centre
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. D. Yee ( CPSO# 59895 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. M. Wiltshire ( CPSO# 65013 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. S. Chapman ( CPSO# 93976 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. M. Garnett ( CPSO# 95471 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4


Corporation Name: Lansdell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KYLE LANSDELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANSDELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2012