skip to content

Lai, Tin Lung Eric

CPSO#: 103634

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6100
Fax: 8073468113 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. D. Yee ( CPSO# 59895 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. M. Wiltshire ( CPSO# 65013 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. S. Chapman ( CPSO# 93976 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. M. Garnett ( CPSO# 95471 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4


Corporation Name: J. Kornder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)
Dr. J. Kornder ( CPSO# 107184)

Business Address:
Fort William Family Health Team
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1234

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TIN LUNG ERIC LAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017