skip to content

Wiltshire, Marc Lloyd

CPSO#: 65013

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 May 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 May 1992

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Garnett ( CPSO# 95471 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. M. Wiltshire ( CPSO# 65013 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. D. Yee ( CPSO# 59895 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. S. Chapman ( CPSO# 93976 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. D. Savage ( CPSO# 103493)
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4


Corporation Name: Marc Wiltshire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wiltshire ( CPSO# 65013 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARC LLOYD WILTSHIRE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILTSHIRE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 1992