skip to content

Apostle, Nicole Alexandra

CPSO#: 86014

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb St
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-1234 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole Apostle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 10 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Apostle ( CPSO# 86014 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Area Hospital
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLE ALEXANDRA APOSTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APOSTLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Mar 2007 to 08 Apr 2007
EL - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
EL - Palliative Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016