skip to content

Lee, Margaret Anne Fogerty

CPSO#: 62320

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1991

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Fogerty, Margaret Anne (used until: 25 Aug 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 759-7487 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. M. Culina ( CPSO# 101002)
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. M. Beduhn ( CPSO# 104325)
Dr. k. babik ( CPSO# 105663)
Dr. A. Webb ( CPSO# 106566)

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: MAF Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARGARET ANNE FOGERTY LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1991