Jarrett, Blair Lawrence (CPSO#: 102167)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Oct 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone: 705-759-7475
Fax: 705-949-1908
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. B. Banks ( CPSO# 99188 )
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Blair Jarrett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)

Business Address:
170 East Street
Suite 202
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-7475

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BLAIR LAWRENCE JARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARRETT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 22 Oct 2013 to 13 Jan 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 14 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2015