skip to content

Woolner, Kathryn Alison

CPSO#: 112049

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb St
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: 7055412699
Fax: 7057597460 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. P. Maione ( CPSO# 52939 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. S. Stevenson ( CPSO# 72103 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. K. Booth ( CPSO# 79391 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. N. Apostle ( CPSO# 86014 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. Z. Gu ( CPSO# 96515 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Rebelo ( CPSO# 100442)
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. M. Culina ( CPSO# 101002)
Dr. S. Rawn ( CPSO# 101054)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. M. Laviolette ( CPSO# 103656)
Dr. M. Beduhn ( CPSO# 104325)
Dr. T. Oliver ( CPSO# 105931)
Dr. A. Webb ( CPSO# 106566)
Dr. R. Duffus ( CPSO# 109207)
Dr. V. Murdoch ( CPSO# 109888)
Dr. K. Waqas ( CPSO# 110838)
Dr. K. Woolner ( CPSO# 112049)

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: K. Woolner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Woolner ( CPSO# 112049)

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Business Address:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ALISON WOOLNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOOLNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2019