skip to content

Stewart, Jodie Patricia

CPSO#: 72520

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Center
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Fax: (705) 759-5668 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospitals
750 Great Northern Rd.
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. K. Booth ( CPSO# 79391 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. N. Apostle ( CPSO# 86014 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. M. Culina ( CPSO# 101002)
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. M. Beduhn ( CPSO# 104325)
Dr. K. Babik ( CPSO# 105663)
Dr. A. Webb ( CPSO# 106566)

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Jodie Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )

Business Address:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JODIE PATRICIA STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000