skip to content

Duffus, Robyn Michelle

CPSO#: 109207

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb St
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-541-2643
Fax: 705-541-2304 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. P. Maione ( CPSO# 52939 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. S. Stevenson ( CPSO# 72103 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. K. Booth ( CPSO# 79391 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. N. Apostle ( CPSO# 86014 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. Z. Gu ( CPSO# 96515 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Rebelo ( CPSO# 100442)
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. M. Culina ( CPSO# 101002)
Dr. S. Rawn ( CPSO# 101054)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. M. Laviolette ( CPSO# 103656)
Dr. M. Beduhn ( CPSO# 104325)
Dr. T. Oliver ( CPSO# 105931)
Dr. A. Webb ( CPSO# 106566)
Dr. R. Duffus ( CPSO# 109207)
Dr. V. Murdoch ( CPSO# 109888)
Dr. K. Waqas ( CPSO# 110838)
Dr. K. Woolner ( CPSO# 112049)

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:11 Sep 2020 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBYN MICHELLE DUFFUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUFFUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2020