THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 17:13:00 PM
Apostle, Nicole Alexandra
CPSO#:
86014
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Apr 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Apr 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb St
Sault Ste. Marie ON P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-1234
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sault Area Hospital |
Sault Ste. Marie |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Jun 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICOLE ALEXANDRA APOSTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. APOSTLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 19 Mar 2007 to 08 Apr 2007
EL - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 09 Mar 2009 to 05 Apr 2009
EL - Palliative Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 08 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Apr 2016 |