skip to content

Colla, Simon

CPSO#: 24624

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hotz Sidlofsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )
Dr. S. Colla ( CPSO# 24624 )
Dr. S. Nusinowitz ( CPSO# 30834 )
Dr. R. Feldman ( CPSO# 50541 )
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )
Dr. R. Sidlofsky ( CPSO# 76781 )
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )
Dr. J. Pelchovitz ( CPSO# 95409 )
Dr. S. Kraus ( CPSO# 104638)
Dr. Y. Lazarev ( CPSO# 112341)

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-2776

Medical Records Location

Address: Doctor's Office: 491 Lawrence Avenue West, Unit 101, Toronto, ON M5M 1C7
Date Received: 03 Jan 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2019

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 30, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Simon Colla to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 30, 2020:

College investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Colla engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent. In the face of these investigations, Dr. Colla resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)