skip to content

Gelkopf, Marvin Alden

CPSO#: 60783

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Suite 101
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: (416) 787-5693
Fax: (416) 787-8094 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hotz Sidlofsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kraus ( CPSO# 104638)
Dr. D. Nahon ( CPSO# 81227 )
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )
Dr. S. Colla ( CPSO# 24624 )
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )
Dr. S. Nusinowitz ( CPSO# 30834 )
Dr. R. Sidlofsky ( CPSO# 76781 )
Dr. R. Feldman ( CPSO# 50541 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-2776


Corporation Name: Gelkopf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-5693

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARVIN ALDEN GELKOPF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GELKOPF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.