skip to content

Pelchovitz, Jeffrey Ian

CPSO#: 95409

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Doctors Office Toronto
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: 416-787-0323
Fax: 647-288-0170 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hotz Sidlofsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )
Dr. S. Colla ( CPSO# 24624 )
Dr. S. Nusinowitz ( CPSO# 30834 )
Dr. R. Feldman ( CPSO# 50541 )
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )
Dr. R. Sidlofsky ( CPSO# 76781 )
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )
Dr. J. Pelchovitz ( CPSO# 95409 )
Dr. S. Kraus ( CPSO# 104638)
Dr. Y. Lazarev ( CPSO# 112341)

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-2776


Corporation Name: Jeffrey Pelchovitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Pelchovitz ( CPSO# 95409 )

Business Address:
8 York Street
Suite 4
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone Number: (416) 366-2273

Business Address:
101 - 491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 782-0323

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY IAN PELCHOVITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PELCHOVITZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2013