skip to content

Lazarev, Yosef

CPSO#: 112341

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Ave W
North York ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: 4167879796
Fax: 6472880170 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hotz Sidlofsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )
Dr. S. Colla ( CPSO# 24624 )
Dr. S. Nusinowitz ( CPSO# 30834 )
Dr. R. Feldman ( CPSO# 50541 )
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )
Dr. R. Sidlofsky ( CPSO# 76781 )
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )
Dr. J. Pelchovitz ( CPSO# 95409 )
Dr. S. Kraus ( CPSO# 104638)
Dr. Y. Lazarev ( CPSO# 112341)

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-2776

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Aug 2019 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YOSEF LAZAREV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAZAREV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2018 to 15 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 16 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2019 to 26 Aug 2019
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2019