skip to content

Weisbrod, Maxwell Jacob

CPSO#: 109128

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101-491 Lawrence Ave W
North York ON  M5M 1C7
Phone: 4167870117
Fax: 6472880170 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

101-491 Lawrence Ave W
North York ON  M5M 1C7
Canada
Phone: 416-787-0117
Fax: 6472880170
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hotz Sidlofsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )
Dr. S. Colla ( CPSO# 24624 )
Dr. S. Nusinowitz ( CPSO# 30834 )
Dr. R. Feldman ( CPSO# 50541 )
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )
Dr. R. Sidlofsky ( CPSO# 76781 )
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )
Dr. J. Pelchovitz ( CPSO# 95409 )
Dr. S. Kraus ( CPSO# 104638)
Dr. M. Weisbrod ( CPSO# 109128)
Dr. Y. Lazarev ( CPSO# 112341)
Dr. R. Sheinerman ( CPSO# 117015)

Business Address:
1401-619 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON  M4V 2K6
Phone Number: 4164642125

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-2776


Corporation Name: Max Weisbrod Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Weisbrod ( CPSO# 109128)

Business Address:
Bloor Medical Clinic
844 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3G1
Phone Number: (416) 534-4214

Business Address:
101-491 Lawrence Ave W
North York ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: 4167870117

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAXWELL JACOB WEISBROD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEISBROD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018