skip to content

Tan, Kong Teng

CPSO#: 79902

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Malay

Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
PMB 1-293
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: 4163404800 Ext. 6166
Fax: (416) 593-0502 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Corporation Name: H. Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )
Dr. M. Lax ( CPSO# 68111 )
Dr. T. Chung ( CPSO# 74873 )
Dr. H. Schmidt ( CPSO# 77345 )
Dr. D. Mandell ( CPSO# 79347 )
Dr. K. Tan ( CPSO# 79902 )
Dr. R. Mohan ( CPSO# 85166 )
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 88698 )
Dr. I. Khalili ( CPSO# 91751 )
Dr. P. Veit-Haibach ( CPSO# 111742)

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
256 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400


Corporation Name: Dr. KT Tan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2022

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Tan ( CPSO# 79902 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
PMB 1-293
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Sinai Health
522 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1W7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:08 May 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KONG TENG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 24 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007