skip to content

Veit-Haibach, Patrick

CPSO#: 111742

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Nov 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 25 Apr 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education: Gesamthochschule Essen, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
585 University Ave
1 PMB-275
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 6085 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )
Dr. M. Lax ( CPSO# 68111 )
Dr. T. Chung ( CPSO# 74873 )
Dr. H. Schmidt ( CPSO# 77345 )
Dr. D. Mandell ( CPSO# 79347 )
Dr. K. Tan ( CPSO# 79902 )
Dr. R. Mohan ( CPSO# 85166 )
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 88698 )
Dr. I. Khalili ( CPSO# 91751 )
Dr. P. Veit-Haibach ( CPSO# 111742)

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
256 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400


Corporation Name: Veit-Haibach Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Veit-Haibach ( CPSO# 111742)

Business Address:
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2

Business Address:
585 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2

Business Address:
263 McCaul Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
263 McCaul Street
4th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1W7
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
102 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Z2

Business Address:
102 - 1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Z2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:25 Apr 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:25 Apr 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jan 2020
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Nov 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Patrick Veit-Haibach may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medical
                        Imaging,  University of Toronto, in which Dr. Veit-Haibach holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires  when  Dr. Veit-
                  Haibach no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.