skip to content

Farb, Richard Ian

CPSO#: 55462

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1986

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
McLaughlin 3-404
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2636
Fax: (416) 603-4257 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Corporation Name: Farb Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Suite 3MC404
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5981


Corporation Name: H. Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )
Dr. M. Lax ( CPSO# 68111 )
Dr. T. Chung ( CPSO# 74873 )
Dr. H. Schmidt ( CPSO# 77345 )
Dr. D. Mandell ( CPSO# 79347 )
Dr. K. Tan ( CPSO# 79902 )
Dr. R. Mohan ( CPSO# 85166 )
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 88698 )
Dr. I. Khalili ( CPSO# 91751 )
Dr. P. Veit-Haibach ( CPSO# 111742)

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
256 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD IAN FARB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1986