skip to content

Schmidt, Heidi Christa

CPSO#: 77345

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Oct 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 18 Oct 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Roberts, Heidi Christa (used until: 15 Dec 2015 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education: Johannes Gutenberg University at Mainz, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
1-PMB 286
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 323-3422 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017
Corporation Name: Dr. Heidi Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 15 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Schmidt ( CPSO# 77345 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Room 2231
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6186

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hosital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800


Corporation Name: H. Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Farb ( CPSO# 55462 )
Dr. M. Lax ( CPSO# 68111 )
Dr. T. Chung ( CPSO# 74873 )
Dr. H. Schmidt ( CPSO# 77345 )
Dr. D. Mandell ( CPSO# 79347 )
Dr. K. Tan ( CPSO# 79902 )
Dr. R. Mohan ( CPSO# 85166 )
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 88698 )
Dr. I. Khalili ( CPSO# 91751 )
Dr. P. Veit-Haibach ( CPSO# 111742)

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
562 - 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X6
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
1 - PMP 284
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Suite 256, 3rd Floor
256 - 399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Suite 918
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 13 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Schmidt ( CPSO# 77345 )

Business Address:
41 Ramsay Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:04 Mar 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2002
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 20 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Oct 2012 Active
             Dr. Heidi Christa Roberts may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology, only.