THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 23:32:47 PM
Tan, Kong Teng
CPSO#:
79902
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Malay
Education: Queen's University Belfast School of Med, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
PMB 1-293
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Phone: 4163404800 Ext. 6166
Fax: (416) 593-0502
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:08 May 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KONG TENG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 24 Sep 2003
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2007 |