skip to content

DellaVedova, Jonathan Redvers Jordan

CPSO#: 91071

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. M. Culina ( CPSO# 101002)
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. M. Beduhn ( CPSO# 104325)
Dr. k. babik ( CPSO# 105663)
Dr. A. Webb ( CPSO# 106566)

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Center
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: DellaVedova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )

Business Address:
Group Health Centre
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JONATHAN REDVERS JORDAN DELLAVEDOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DELLAVEDOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013