skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/05/22 21:49:36 PM

Freedman, Paul Edward

CPSO#: 23615

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 1971
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1971

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )

Business Address:
1500 - 333 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5H 2R2
Phone Number: (416) 364-0246

Business Address:
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Suites 101
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-0117

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Family Medicine Unit
402-60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5157


Corporation Name: Hotz Sidlofsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Freedman ( CPSO# 23615 )
Dr. S. Colla ( CPSO# 24624 )
Dr. S. Nusinowitz ( CPSO# 30834 )
Dr. R. Feldman ( CPSO# 50541 )
Dr. S. Gottesman ( CPSO# 56767 )
Dr. M. Gelkopf ( CPSO# 60783 )
Dr. A. Hotz ( CPSO# 67906 )
Dr. R. Sidlofsky ( CPSO# 76781 )
Dr. D. Pankowski ( CPSO# 84291 )
Dr. J. Pelchovitz ( CPSO# 95409 )
Dr. S. Kraus ( CPSO# 104638)
Dr. M. Weisbrod ( CPSO# 109128)
Dr. Y. Lazarev ( CPSO# 112341)
Dr. R. Sheinerman ( CPSO# 117015)

Business Address:
1401-619 Avenue Rd
Toronto ON  M4V 2K6
Phone Number: 4164642125

Business Address:
Suite 101
491 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5M 1C7
Phone Number: (416) 787-2776

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL EDWARD FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1971