THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:26:43 AM
Bartlett, Eric Steven
CPSO#:
79820
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Oklahoma, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
Room 3-956
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 6320
Fax: (416) 946-6564
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:20 Jul 2009 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Neuroradiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 22 Dec 2010 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Dec 2010 |
|
Active |