skip to content

Khalili, Ida

CPSO#: 91751

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Khalili-Boroujeni, Ida (used until: 06 Dec 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, French

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joint Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto General Hospital 1PMB-298
585 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (647) 995-0152
Fax: (416) 593-0502 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ida Khalili Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Khalili ( CPSO# 91751 )

Business Address:
585 University Avenue
Room 1 PMB 286
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IDA KHALILI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALILI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009