skip to content

Gonzalez Berjon, Jose Miguel

CPSO#: 102034

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Aug 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 1233 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Queen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. B. Danielson ( CPSO# 93246 )
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Corporation Name: Dr. Jose Miguel Gonzalez Berjon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 27 Aug 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Aug 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Jan 2015

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2015 Active
             Dr.  Jose  Miguel  Gonzalez  Berjon  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            anatomical pathology and haematological pathology.