THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:35:21 AM
Gonzalez Berjon, Jose Miguel
CPSO#:
102034
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
27 Aug 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
27 Aug 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad La Salle Escuela, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Ramsey Lake Health Centre
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Ext. 1233
Electoral District: 08
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
USA - Virginia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:27 Aug 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Aug 2013 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 26 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Jan 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Jan 2015 |
|
Active |