skip to content

Saab, Jad

CPSO#: 119532

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Jul 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:American University of Beirut, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Pathology
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7100 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Queen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. K. Williams ( CPSO# 91025 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)
Dr. J. Saab ( CPSO# 119532)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Corporation Name: Dr. Jad Saab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Saab ( CPSO# 119532)

Business Address:
Health Science North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 665-2696

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective:08 Jul 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jul 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Jan 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2020 Active
 Dr. JAD SAAB may practise medicine independently in general pathology.