skip to content

McClure, Rebecca Frances

CPSO#: 101763

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Jul 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: 705-822-6446 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Queen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Widjanarko ( CPSO# 51679 )
Dr. M. Queen ( CPSO# 51719 )
Dr. S. Gaytan-Garcia Graham ( CPSO# 60547 )
Dr. A. Tomczak-Bojarski ( CPSO# 73304 )
Dr. B. Mitrovic ( CPSO# 91572 )
Dr. B. Danielson ( CPSO# 93246 )
Dr. M. Ngae ( CPSO# 94283 )
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)
Dr. J. Gonzalez Berjon ( CPSO# 102034)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
Department of Pathology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Corporation Name: Dr. Rebecca McClure Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. McClure ( CPSO# 101763)

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 04 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Hematological Pathology Effective: 04 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 31 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2014 Active
             Dr.  Rebecca  Frances McClure may practise medicine independently in Anatomical
            and Haematological Pathology, only.