THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 14:57:23 PM
Ashmawy, Ramy Osama Mohamed Abd El Moniem Hassan
CPSO#:
101079
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Dec 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Crt
Oshawa ON L1G 2B9
Phone: 4164549397
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Egypt
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Lakeridge Health |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:04 Sep 2020 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAMY OSAMA MOHAMED ABD EL MONIEM HASSAN ASHMAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHMAWY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Pediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
PEAP - R - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2015 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2020 |