skip to content

Dotsikas, Gus

CPSO#: 66718

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
One Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 686-6411 Ext. 4305 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

47 Liberty St. south
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Canada
Phone: (905) 686-6411 Ext. 1370
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 106563)
Dr. R. Lo ( CPSO# 106683)

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702


Corporation Name: Dotsikas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Business Address:
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 668-6831

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GUS DOTSIKAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DOTSIKAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998