skip to content

Levine, Richard Jay

CPSO#: 78178

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2002
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 686-6411 Ext. 34305
Fax: (905) 721-4770 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

95 Bayly St W,
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: 9054280444
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 106563)
Dr. R. Lo ( CPSO# 106683)

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702


Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Levine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Port Perry Site
451 Paxton Street
Port Perry ON  L9L 1L9
Phone Number: (905) 985-7321

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Whitby Site
300 Gordon Street
Whitby ON  L1N 5T2
Phone Number: (905) 668-6831

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Bowmanville Site
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health - Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 686-6411


Corporation Name: Primary Test03 Corp
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD JAY LEVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEVINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002