skip to content

Rastogi, Aroop

CPSO#: 68153

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Dec 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Department of Radiology
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

101-95 Bayly St
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Canada
Phone: (905) 428-0444
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

222 king street east, suite 1101
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 623-4512
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rastogi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )

Business Address:
Suite 1101
222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-4512

Business Address:
Taunton Imaging Centre
1250 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-4305

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4

Business Address:
Durham Radiology Associates Inc.
101-95 Bayly Street
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Port Perry
451 Paxton Street
P.O. Box 960
Port Perry ON  L9L 1A8


Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )
Dr. J. Lee ( CPSO# 106563)
Dr. R. Lo ( CPSO# 106683)

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health Scugog Port Perry Site Port Perry
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AROOP RASTOGI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RASTOGI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1999