skip to content

Khalatbari, Azadeh

CPSO#: 93796

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
34 Eglington Ave west
Room: 316
Toronto ON  M4R 2H6
Phone: (647) 293-3266 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Levine Myers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asch ( CPSO# 52679 )
Dr. A. Myers ( CPSO# 61041 )
Dr. G. Dotsikas ( CPSO# 66718 )
Dr. A. Rastogi ( CPSO# 68153 )
Dr. G. Donsky ( CPSO# 73822 )
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 78178 )
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 81024 )
Dr. A. Raikhlin ( CPSO# 86803 )
Dr. W. Wei ( CPSO# 86891 )
Dr. E. Ng ( CPSO# 90845 )
Dr. A. Khalatbari ( CPSO# 93796 )
Dr. S. Galante ( CPSO# 98914 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
Baywood X-Ray & Ultrasound
Baywood Medical Clinic
101 - 95 Bayly Avenue
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 428-0444

Business Address:
Bowmanville X-Ray & Ultrasound
1101 - 222 King Street East
Bowmanville ON  L1C 1P6
Phone Number: (905) 623-2727

Business Address:
King Street X-Ray & Ultrasound
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-7702


Corporation Name: Dr. Azadeh Khalatbari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khalatbari ( CPSO# 93796 )

Business Address:
10 Manorcrest Drive
Toronto ON  M2N 5K1
Phone Number: (647) 293-3266

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:10 Aug 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AZADEH KHALATBARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALATBARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 11 Aug 2015 to 23 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2015