THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 12:28:06 PM
Thassanapaff, Vatinee
CPSO#:
94847
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
16 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
East Tower
2nd Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-6166
Fax: (905) 721-6604
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:16 Feb 2011 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Feb 2011 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Oct 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Aug 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Aug 2012 |
|
Active |