skip to content

Thassanapaff, Vatinee

CPSO#: 94847

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Feb 2011
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Tower
2nd Floor
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-6166
Fax: (905) 721-6604 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Li ( CPSO# 85719 )
Dr. V. Thassanapaff ( CPSO# 94847 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:16 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2012

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2012 Active
              Dr. Vatinee Thassanapaff may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics,
                                                 only.