skip to content

Li, David Sung-Ling

CPSO#: 85719

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Ross University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 723-8551 Ext. 5298
Fax: (905) 721-6613 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. David Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 11 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Li ( CPSO# 85719 )
Dr. V. Thassanapaff ( CPSO# 94847 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID SUNG-LING LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2008