THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 13:32:53 PM
Kornder, Julia Louise
CPSO#:
107184
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 May 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 May 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2014
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Fort William Family Health Team
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1234
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Jul 2016 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JULIA LOUISE KORNDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORNDER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jul 2015
EL - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Oct 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 May 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 2017 |