skip to content

Kornder, Julia Louise

CPSO#: 107184

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 May 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 May 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Fort William Family Health Team
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone: (807) 626-1234 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. Kornder Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lai ( CPSO# 103634)
Dr. J. Kornder ( CPSO# 107184)

Business Address:
Fort William Family Health Team
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1234

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jul 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIA LOUISE KORNDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KORNDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Jul 2015
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 19 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2017