skip to content

Marchuk, Yuri

CPSO#: 90047

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Mar 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 05 Mar 2012
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:National Medical University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
Physical Med and Rehab
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Fax: (519) 257-5137 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yuri Marchuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Marchuk ( CPSO# 90047 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
Department of physical Med and Rehab
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5184


Corporation Name: Naaman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Marchuk ( CPSO# 90047 )
Dr. S. Naaman ( CPSO# 96638 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Phys Med and Rehabiliation
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5184


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Delaware

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 05 Mar 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2012 Active
             Dr.  Yuri  Marchuk may practise medicine independently in physical medicine and
            rehabilitation, only.