THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:15:25 AM
Marchuk, Yuri
CPSO#:
90047
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Mar 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: National Medical University, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
Physical Med and Rehab
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON N9C 3Z4
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Fax: (519) 257-5137
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Delaware
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation |
Effective:05 Mar 2012 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Nov 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Nov 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 05 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Mar 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Dec 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 14 Dec 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Dec 2012 |
|
Active |