skip to content

Rajkotwala, Victor Abdulhusein

CPSO#: 84844

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi

Education: University of Bombay, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Humber College Boulevard
ETOBICOKE HOSPITAL
DEPARTMENT OF INTERNAL MEDICINE
Toronto ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: 4164942120 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

IHealth Centre
6175 Hwy#7, Unit 19-22
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 850-3091
Fax: 4168408434
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch St
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

HEALTHPLEX
150 WEST DR.
Brampton ON  L6T4P9
Canada
Phone: 9054547410
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

3075 Hospital Gate
Halton Hyperbarics
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Canada
Phone: 4372918555
Fax: 2893513036
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

55 Mountainash Road
Osler Hyperbarics & Wound Care
Brampton ON  L6R 1W4
Canada
Phone: 3657471470
Fax: 9052160594
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

17730 Leslie Street
York Hyperbaric Medicine Centre
Newmarket ON  L3Y 4W4
Canada
Phone: 2898039119
Fax: 9052351277
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1692 Lakeshore Road West
Under Pressure Hyperbaric Treatment
Mississauga ON  L5J 1J5
Canada
Phone: 9052742032
Fax: 9052744067
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Victor Rajkotwala Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Rajkotwala ( CPSO# 84844 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
Vaughan Diagnostic Medical Centre
Suites 19 and 22
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone Number: (416) 297-8362

Business Address:
Suite 4
2 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 3E1
Phone Number: (289) 323-0660

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
1692 Lakeshore Rd W
Mississauga ON  L5J 1J5
Phone Number: 9052742032

Business Address:
150 West Dr
Brampton ON  L6T 4P9
Phone Number: 9054547410

Business Address:
100-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: 4372918555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:01 Jan 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VICTOR ABDULHUSEIN RAJKOTWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJKOTWALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008