THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 20:34:31 PM
Rajkotwala, Victor Abdulhusein
CPSO#:
84844
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi
Education: University of Bombay, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3075 Hospital Gate
Halton Hyperbarics
Oakville ON L6M 1M1
Phone: 4372918555
Fax: 2893513036
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. VICTOR ABDULHUSEIN RAJKOTWALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAJKOTWALA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Apr 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jul 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Apr 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 2008 |