skip to content

Shahid, Azmeh

CPSO#: 85517

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
71 Lawton Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4V 1Z6
Phone: 4164501294 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

227 victoria street
youthdale treatment centre
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Canada
Phone: (416) 363-3751 Ext. 2390
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

227 victoria street
youthdale child and adolescent
sleep center
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Canada
Phone: 4167030505
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

hospital alliance group
764 B Bakers crescent
Timmins ON  K7M 6P6
Canada
Phone: 613-389-4400
Fax: 613-389-4450
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

764 Baker Cres
Kingston ON  K7M 6P6
Canada
Phone: 613-389-4400
Fax: 613-389-4450
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N T Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 82092 )
Dr. A. Shahid ( CPSO# 85517 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain Management
Unit 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Business Address:
212-6 Jackes Ave
Toronto ON  M4T 0A5


Corporation Name: Azmeh Shahid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shahid ( CPSO# 85517 )

Business Address:
Youthdale Treatment Centre
Department of Psychiatry
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone Number: (416) 363-3751

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:12 Jan 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 05 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017 Active
             Dr. Azmeh Shahid may practise medicine independently in child and adolescent
            psychiatry.