skip to content

Siddiqui, Naveed Tahir

CPSO#: 82092

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Aug 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
19- 104 Dept Anesthesia
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5270
Fax: (416) 586-8664 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N T Siddiqui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Siddiqui ( CPSO# 82092 )
Dr. A. Shahid ( CPSO# 85517 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain Management
Unit 19-104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Business Address:
212-6 Jackes Ave
Toronto ON  M4T 0A5

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:03 Aug 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 28 Feb 2005
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 27 Jul 2007
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 May 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Mar 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Mar 2013 Active
 Dr.  Naveed  Tahir Siddiqui may practise medicine independently in anaesthesia,
            only.