THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 9:58:55 AM
Shahid, Azmeh
CPSO#:
85517
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
71 Lawton Boulevard
Toronto ON M4V 1Z6
Phone: 4164501294
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Jan 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2006 to 05 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2017 |
|
Active |