skip to content

Ko, Samuel

CPSO#: 79185

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 773-0102
Fax: (416) 773-0103 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

9390 Woodbine Ave
Suite 1E3
Markham ON  L6C 0M5
Canada
Phone: 905-766-4700
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

70 Forest Manor Rd
North York ON  M2J 0A9
Canada
Phone: 416-792-1266
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

670 Highway 7
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 4R8
Canada
Phone: 905-886-7300
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

418 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7T 2C8
Canada
Phone: 905-631-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Samuel Ko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ko ( CPSO# 79185 )

Business Address:
Unit 304
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1S 4T7
Phone Number: (416) 773-0102

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAMUEL KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2009