THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 14:53:53 PM
Ko, Samuel
CPSO#:
79185
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Jan 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin
Education: Queen's University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 304
4190 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON M1S 4T7
Phone: (416) 773-0102
Fax: (416) 773-0103
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: January 25, 2024
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On January 26, 2023, Michael Garron Hospital notified the College, pursuant to s. 33 of the Public Hospitals Act and 85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act), that Dr. Ko has agreed not to exercise his on-call privileges at the hospital pending a hospital review into elements of Dr. Ko’s practice.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:31 Dec 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMUEL KO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2005 to 31 Mar 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 Jan 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jan 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2009 |