Isaacson, Steven (CPSO#: 55070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
True North Imaging
120 - 7330 Yonge St
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mackenzie Health
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-1212 Ext. 7112
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

X-Ray Associates
Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Canada
Phone: 289 553 6336
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Isaacson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Isaacson ( CPSO# 55070 )

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Suite 120
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y7

Business Address:
Sheppard Ultrasound
Unit 5 & 6
1780 Markham Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 2W2

Business Address:
Meadowvale Boulevard Imaging
2180 Meadowvale Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5N 5S3

Business Address:
Suite 317
Kennedy Road Ultrasound
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2

Business Address:
Grandview X-Ray & Ultrasound
167 Hespeler Road
Cambridge ON  N1R 3H7

Business Address:
Markham Mammography
39 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X3

Business Address:
Mobile Ultrasound
65 Univeristy Avenue East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2V9

Business Address:
Oakville Diagnostic Imaging
2035 Cornwall Road
Oakville ON  L6J 7S2

Business Address:
True North Imaging Waterloo X-Ray & Ultrasound
65 University Avenue East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2V9

Business Address:
North York Ultrasound
4025 Yonge Street
Suite 215
Toronto ON  M2P 2E3
Phone Number: (416) 299-6887

Business Address:
True North Imaging Canamera X-Ray & Ultrasound
Suite B9
350 Conestoga Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7L7

Business Address:
Bloor East Ultrasound
15th Floor
160 Bloor Street East
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Markham Women's Imaging
Unit 1
39 Main Street North
Markham ON  L3P 1X3

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Toronto West Ultrasound
1560 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 1A6

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Franklin X-Ray & Ultrasound
Suite 101
1150 Franklin Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 7J2

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Etobicoke Women's Imaging
Unit 1-4
110 Queen`s Plate Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9W 0B4

Business Address:
True North Imaging
MidTown Diagnostic Imaging
Lower Level - Room 6
1849 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4S 1Y2

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Thornhill Diagnostic Imaging
Suite 206
7330 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1V8

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Markham Reproductive Imaging
Suite 305
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1

Business Address:
True North Imaging
North Toronto Diagnostic Imaging St. Clair
2938 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1W 2T4

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Victoria/Kitchener Ultrasound Mammography & X-Ray
Suite B2
751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N4

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Fairway X-Ray & Ultrasound
385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener ON  N2C 1X2

Business Address:
True North Imaging
Reproductive Imaging
18th Floor
655 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2K4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 29 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN ISAACSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAACSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1986